EP0470522 - Method for the preparation of metallic carbides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.1995 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.1995 [1995/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKW Trostberg Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 12 62, Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 D-83308 Trostberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | For all designated states SKW TROSTBERG AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 12 62, Dr.-Albert-Frank-Strasse 32 D-83308 Trostberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Herrmann, Wolfgang A., Prof. Dr. Gartenstrasse 69 W-8050 Freising / DE | 02 /
Härter, Peter, Dr. Wendelsteinstrasse 17 W-8058 Erding / DE | [1994/21] |
Former [1992/07] | 01 /
Herrmann, Wolfgang A., Prof. Dr. Gartenstrasse 69 W-8050 Freising / DE | ||
02 /
Hórter, Peter, Dr. Wendelsteinstrasse 17 W-8058 Erding / DE | Representative(s) | Huber, Bernhard, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/01] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/07] | Huber, Bernhard, Dipl.-Chem. Patentanwälte H. Weickmann, Dr. K. Fincke F.A. Weickmann, B. Huber Dr. H. Liska, Dr. J. Prechtel, Dr. B. Böhm Postfach 86 08 20 D-81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91113043.3 | 02.08.1991 | [1992/07] | Priority number, date | DE19904025120 | 08.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4025120 | [1992/07] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0470522 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0470522 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470522 | Date: | 25.05.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C01B31/30, C01B31/34 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
C01B32/949 (EP);
C01B32/90 (EP);
C01B32/914 (EP);
C01P2006/60 (EP);
C01P2006/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/07] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Metallcarbiden | [1992/07] | English: | Method for the preparation of metallic carbides | [1992/07] | French: | Procédé de fabrication de carbures métalliques | [1992/07] | Examination procedure | 04.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 03.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3825469 (ECONOMY J, et al); | [A]US4552740 (MORGAN PETER E D [US], et al); | [A]EP0286294 (NAT RES DEV [GB]) | [AD] - CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, N.2, 1990 C. H. JAGGERS AND AL. " PREPARATION OF HIGH-SUR-FACE-AREA TRANSITION-METAL NITRIDES: Mo2N AND MoN" ZEILEN 150-157 |