EP0476286 - Encapsulation for an internal combustion engine in a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.09.1995 [1995/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 80976 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states MAN Nutzfahrzeuge Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 50 06 20 D-80976 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Feitzelmayer, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Bussardstrasse 124 D-8031 Gröbenzell / DE | 02 /
Drewitz, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Agnesstrasse 59 D-8000 München 40 / DE | 03 /
Stiglmaier, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Am Grübel 7a D-8031 Gilching / DE | [1994/40] |
Former [1992/13] | 01 /
Feitzelmayer, Karl, Dipl.-Ing. Bussardstrasse 124 W-8031 Gröbenzell / DE | ||
02 /
Drewitz, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. Agnesstrasse 59 W 8000 München 40 / DE | |||
03 /
Stiglmaier, Manfred, Dipl.-Ing. Am Grübel 7a W 8031 Gilching / DE | Application number, filing date | 91113082.1 | 03.08.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | DE19904028693U | 10.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4028693 U | [1992/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0476286 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476286 | Date: | 05.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F02B77/13, B60R13/08 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
B60R13/0838 (EP);
B60R13/0876 (EP);
B60R13/0884 (EP);
F02B77/13 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/13] | Title | German: | Kapselung der Verbrennungskraftmaschine in einem Nutzfahrzeug | [1992/13] | English: | Encapsulation for an internal combustion engine in a vehicle | [1992/13] | French: | Enveloppe pour un moteur à combustion interne pour un véhicule | [1992/13] | Examination procedure | 28.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2314088 (LIST HANS [AT]); | [A]FR2318050 (BRITISH LEYLAND UK LTD [GB]); | [A]EP0074941 (KAZDA HERBERT); | [Y]DE3835809 (PELZER HELMUT [DE]) | Examination | US3882951 | DE2801339 |