EP0475073 - Cleaning line [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 09.04.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG Klosterstrasse 20 8406 Winterthur / CH | [2008/39] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schlepfer, Walter Stationsstrasse 3 CH-8406 Winterthur / CH | 02 /
Hauschild, Werner Breitenmattstrasse 43 CH-8635 Dürntenur / CH | 03 /
Faas, Jürg Seuzacherstrasse 16 CH-8474 Dinard / CH | 04 /
Waeber, René Zielstrasse 79 CH-8400 Winterthur / CH | 05 /
Demuth, Robert Maulackerstrasse 17 CH-8309 Nürensdorf / CH | [1992/12] | Application number, filing date | 91113208.2 | 06.08.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | DE19904026330 | 20.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4026330 | [1992/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0475073 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475073 | Date: | 15.05.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D01G23/08 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
D01G23/08 (EP,US);
D01G13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1992/12] | Title | German: | Putzereilinie | [1992/12] | English: | Cleaning line | [1992/12] | French: | Ligne de nettoyage | [1992/12] | Examination procedure | 21.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/25] | 04.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
16.01.1997
29.01.1997
ADMISSIBLE Trützschler GmbH & Co. KG Duvenstrasse 82-92 Postfach 30 04 54 D-41194 Mönchengladbach / DE | [1997/12] | 19.03.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.11.1997 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 07.01.1999 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1999/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.05.1996 | GB | 06.08.1997 | CH | 31.08.1997 | LI | 31.08.1997 | DE | 01.05.1998 | [2006/14] |
Former [1998/45] | FR | 11.10.1996 | |
GB | 06.08.1997 | ||
CH | 31.08.1997 | ||
LI | 31.08.1997 | ||
DE | 01.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/41] | FR | 11.10.1996 | |
GB | 06.08.1997 | ||
DE | 01.05.1998 | ||
Former [1998/30] | FR | 11.10.1996 | |
GB | 06.08.1997 | ||
Former [1997/17] | FR | 11.10.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2573780 (TRUETZSCHLER & CO [DE]); | [A]DE3127544 (TRUETZSCHLER & CO [DE]); | [A]DE1152949 ; | [A]EP0181452 (RIETER AG MASCHF [CH]) |