EP0459534 - Monolith respectively honeycomb catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.10.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.12.1993 [1993/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Degussa GmbH Weissfrauenstrasse 9 60311 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/49] | For all designated states Degussa Aktiengesellschaft Weissfrauenstrasse 9 D-60311 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engler, Bernd, Dr. Treuener Strasse 2 W-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 02 /
Koberstein, Edgar, Dr. Wolfskernstrasse 8 W-8755 Alzenau / DE | 03 /
Lox, Egbert, Dr. Grünaustrasse 9 W-6450 Hanau 9 / DE | 04 /
Völker, Herbert Heimbachring 29 a W-6721 Zeiskam / DE | [1991/49] | Application number, filing date | 91113441.9 | 14.04.1990 | [1991/49] | Priority number, date | DE19893912915 | 20.04.1989 Original published format: DE 3912915 | [1991/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0459534 | Date: | 04.12.1991 | Language: | DE | [1991/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0459534 | Date: | 09.12.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01J35/04, B01J37/02, // B01D53/36 | [1991/49] | CPC: |
B01D53/945 (EP,US);
B01J35/00 (KR);
B01D53/94 (KR);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/396 (KR);
B01J35/56 (EP,KR,US);
B01J37/0242 (EP,US);
F01N3/2803 (EP,US);
F01N2330/02 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1991/49] | Title | German: | Monolith- bzw. wabenförmiger Katalysator | [1991/49] | English: | Monolith respectively honeycomb catalyst | [1991/49] | French: | Catalyseur monolythique, respectivement à structure nid d'abeilles | [1991/49] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Examination procedure | 10.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/49] | 19.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.06.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90107181.1 / EP0399203 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 04.05.1992 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61025644 ; | [A]JP62274746 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 10, Nr. 178 (C-355)[2234], 21. Juni 1986; & JP-A-61 025 644 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP.) 04-02-1986, & JP61025644 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Band 11, Nr. 136 (C-419)[2583], 30. April 1987; & JP-A-62 274 746 (NISSAN MOTOR CO.) 04-12-1986, & JP62274746 A 00000000 |