EP0470644 - Superhard material film structure, process of making and use of same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORTON COMPANY 1 New Bond Street Worcester, MA 01615-0008 / US | [1992/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bigelow, Louis K. 359 Old Littleton Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | 02 /
Frey, Robert M. 28 Brown Street Maynard, MA 01754 / US | 03 /
Cann, Gordon L. 1316 Skyline Drive Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | [1992/10] |
Former [1992/07] | 01 /
Bigelow, Louis K. 359 Old Littleton Road Harvard, MA 01451 / US | ||
02 /
Frey, Robert M. 425 Main Street, Apt. 6B Hudson, MA 01749 / US | |||
03 /
Cann, Gordon L. 1316 Skyline Drive Laguna Beach, CA 92651 / US | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/07] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91113469.0 | 09.08.1991 | [1992/07] | Priority number, date | US19900565304 | 10.08.1990 Original published format: US 565304 | [1992/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0470644 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0470644 | Date: | 26.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0470644 | Date: | 31.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C23C16/26, C23C30/00, C23C16/50 | [1992/07] | CPC: |
C23C16/272 (EP,US);
C23C16/26 (EP,US);
C23C16/27 (EP,US);
C23C16/279 (EP,US);
C23C30/005 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24942 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/07] | Title | German: | Filmstruktur aus superharten Werkstoffen, ihr Herstellungsverfahren und ihre Verwendung | [1992/07] | English: | Superhard material film structure, process of making and use of same | [1992/07] | French: | Structure de films en matériau extra dur, procédé pour sa production et son utilisation | [1992/07] | Examination procedure | 14.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 24.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 04.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.08.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.11.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 23.11.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98114481.9 / EP0909835 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0166708 (SANTRADE LTD [CH]); | [A]EP0330524 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]); | [A]EP0286306 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [X] - RESEARCH DISCLOSURE. no. 309, January 1990, HAVANT GB page 66; ANONYMOUS: 'Layered amorphous carbon' | [A] - *entire document* | Examination | - Patent Abstract of Japan, vol.13, no.145 (c-583)(3493) 10 April 1984 (JP-63307196) |