EP0473974 - Slope compensator for combine harvester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.05.1993 [1993/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 51149 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states Klöckner-Humboldt-Deutz Aktiengesellschaft Nikolaus-August-Otto-Allee 2 D-51149 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Allwörden, Wilhelm, Dipl.-Ing. Alpenstrasse 18 W-7704 Gailingen / DE | [1992/11] | Application number, filing date | 91113492.2 | 12.08.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | DE19904025580 | 11.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4025580 | [1992/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473974 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A01F12/44 | [1992/11] | CPC: |
A01D75/282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/20] |
Former [1992/11] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Hangausgleich für Mähdrescher | [1992/11] | English: | Slope compensator for combine harvester | [1992/11] | French: | Compensateur de pente pour moissonneuse-batteuse | [1992/11] | File destroyed: | 02.10.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.09.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, DK, GR, LI, LU, NL, SE | 12.09.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/19] | 16.12.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/19] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 18.10.1991 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1991 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1991 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1991 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1991 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1991 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1991 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 18.10.1991 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 19.10.1992 | M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE8804062U ; | [X]DE2851777 ; | [X]DE2743733 ; | [X]DE2011413 ; | [X]GB1163486 ; | [X]EP0091538 ; | [X]US3456652 ; | [X]EP0282736 ; | [X]US3910285 ; | [X]US2611487 ; | [X]US2694493 ; | [X]US2692679 ; | [A]WO8704588 |