EP0475094 - Liquid container with delivering valve and activation lever [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 26.07.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2008 | Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representative | published on 06.08.2008 [2008/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Perfect-Valois Ventil GmbH Hildebrandstrasse 20 44319 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states Perfect-Valois Ventil GmbH Hildebrandstrasse 20 D-44319 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Reich, Uwe, Dipl.-Ing. Fehrbelliner Strasse 32 W-5800 Hagen 1 / DE | 02 /
Runte, Peter Heckenstrasse 10 W-4750 Unna-Hemmerde / DE | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91113527.5 | 12.08.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | DE19900011901U | 16.08.1990 Original published format: DE 9011901 U | [1992/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0475094 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475094 | Date: | 19.10.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/14 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
B65D83/206 (EP,US);
B05B11/1057 (EP,US);
B05B11/1002 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/12] | Title | German: | Flüssigkeitsbehälter mit Abgabekopf und Betätigungshebel | [1992/12] | English: | Liquid container with delivering valve and activation lever | [1992/12] | French: | Récipient pour liquides avec bouton de distribution et lévier d'actionnement | [1992/12] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 21.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
18.07.1995
02.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB Opponent's representative Hamilton, Alistair Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.07.1995
02.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House Blackfriars London EC4P 4BQ / GB Opponent's representative Hamilton, Alistair Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1995/37] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
18.07.1995
02.08.1995
ADMISSIBLE Unilever PLC Unilever House, Blackfriars GB-London EC4P 4BQ / GB Opponent's representative Hamilton, Alistair Mewburn Ellis, York House, 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | 24.08.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.04.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.04.1996 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.04.1996 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [1996/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.10.1994 | IT | 19.10.1994 | NL | 19.10.1994 | ES | 20.01.1995 | GB | 12.08.1995 | CH | 31.08.1995 | LI | 31.08.1995 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/44] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
GB | 12.08.1995 | ||
CH | 31.08.1995 | ||
LI | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
IT | 19.10.1994 | ||
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
GB | 12.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/30] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
GB | 12.08.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | BE | 19.10.1994 | |
NL | 19.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/30] | BE | 19.10.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3611820 (HEMPEL HERBERT W); | [A]FR2086558 (OREAL) |