EP0478933 - Hydraulic system, such as a vehicle brake system or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.09.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 D-70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klose, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Rosenstrasse 12 W-7122 Besigheim 3 / DE | 02 /
Schäfer, Ernst-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Karlstrasse 54 W-7016 Gerlingen / DE | 03 /
Schumann, Frank, Dipl.-Ing. Beethovenstrasse 1 W-7141 Möglingen / DE | 04 /
Wetzel, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Auguste-Supper-Weg 12 W-7015 Korntal 1 / DE | 05 /
Müller, Klaus, Dr.-Ing. Mergentheimer Weg 17 W-7146 Tamm / DE | [1992/15] | Application number, filing date | 91113607.5 | 14.08.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | DE19904030862 | 29.09.1990 Original published format: DE 4030862 | [1992/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0478933 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0478933 | Date: | 24.11.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/40, F04B49/10 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B60T8/4068 (EP,US);
B60T8/4036 (EP,US);
F04B49/10 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1744 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/15] | Title | German: | Hydraulisches System, wie Kraftfahrzeug-Bremsanlage oder dergleichen | [1992/15] | English: | Hydraulic system, such as a vehicle brake system or the like | [1992/15] | French: | Système hydraulique, tel qu'un système de freinage de véhicule ou analogue | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 04.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.04.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 24.11.1993 | IT | 24.11.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 24.11.1993 | |
FR | 15.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | FR | 15.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP01182153 ; | [AD]DE2643860 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT); | [A]EP0379957 (LUCAS IND PLC [GB]); | [A]DE3133111 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]); | [A]US4520837 (COLE CLINTON W [US], et al); | [A]EP0159373 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 465 (M-882)(3813) 20. Oktober 1989 & JP-A-01 182 153 ( ATSUGI MOTOR PARTS CO. ) 20. Juli 1989, & JP01182153 A 00000000 | Examination | EP0264574 |