EP0475108 - Powder lacquers and the use of selected binder compositions in powder lacquers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.09.1995 [1995/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAYER AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states BAYER AG D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wamprecht, Christian, Dr. Regattastrasse 20 W-4040 Neuss 22 / DE | 02 /
Kreuder, Hans-Joachim, Dr. Auf Rothenfeld 23a W-4154 Tönisvorst 2 / DE | [1992/12] | Application number, filing date | 91113728.9 | 16.08.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | DE19904027281 | 29.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4027281 | [1992/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0475108 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475108 | Date: | 21.09.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C09D5/03, C09D201/06, C09D133/00 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
C09D163/00 (EP,US);
C09D133/12 (EP,US);
C08L63/00 (EP,US);
Y10S525/934 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C09D133/12, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C09D163/00, C08L2666/04 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | Pulverlacke und die Verwendung von ausgewählten Bindemittelkombinationen für Pulverlacke | [1992/12] | English: | Powder lacquers and the use of selected binder compositions in powder lacquers | [1992/12] | French: | Vernis en poudre et l'utilisation de combinaisons de liants choisies en des vernis en poudre | [1992/12] | Examination procedure | 03.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/23] | 11.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 03.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.06.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4211691 (FITZGERALD EMERSON B [US], et al); | [A]EP0445639 (HOECHST AG [DE]) |