EP0474050 - Magnetic optical disc [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.01.2000 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.03.2000 [2000/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Igarashi, Shuichi, c/o Sony Magnetic Products. Ing., 5-6 Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/11] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91114087.9 | 22.08.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | JP19900222831 | 24.08.1990 Original published format: JP 22283190 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0474050 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0474050 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0474050 | Date: | 10.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B11/10, B29D17/00, B29C45/26 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G11B11/10582 (EP,US);
G11B11/10 (KR);
B29C45/263 (EP,US);
G11B11/10584 (EP,US);
B29C2045/0041 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/11] | G11B11/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/11] | Title | German: | Magneto-optische Scheibe | [1992/11] | English: | Magnetic optical disc | [1992/11] | French: | Disque magnéto-optique | [1992/11] | Examination procedure | 03.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 16.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.05.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/09] | Request for further processing for: | 10.06.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 10.06.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.08.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4876133 (SUGIYAMA TOSHINORI [JP], et al); | [X]EP0355589 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES [JP]) | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE vol. 899, 1988, WASHINGTON pages 16 - 23 T. TAKEDA 'System Design of Optical Microdisk Subsystem' | [A] - IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS June 1990, pages 364 - 365 E. SCHROEDER, D. UHDE 'Extending the Performance of the Rewritable Magnetooptical Disc' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE vol. 1078, 1989, WASHINGTON pages 201 - 203 'Effect of Birefringence in Polycarbonate Substrates on Dynamic Performance of Magnetooptical Disks' | [A] - JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING vol. 24, no. 248, August 1987, TOKYO pages 88 - 91 K. OTA 'Sharp Originates Four-Layer Film Rewritable Magneto-optical Disk' | [XP] - JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING vol. 28, no. 295, July 1991, TOKYO pages 104 - 106 'System Records Digitally on Magnetooptical Mini-Disks' | Examination | - CHEN, "Magnetic materials for optical recording", APPLIED OPTICS, vol. 13, no. 4, pages 767 - 778 |