EP0477537 - Timing generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.11.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.12.1998 [1998/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Imamura, Makoto 2-3-13-1103, Tsutsujigaoka Akishima-shi, Tokyo 196 / JP | 02 /
Kohno, Jun 1-4-17, Nukui-minami-cho Koganei-shi, Tokyo 184 / JP | 03 /
Arasawa, Hisaki 6-5-7-404, Jyosui-honcho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo 187 / JP | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Henkel & Partner mbB Patentanwaltskanzlei, Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Maximiliansplatz 21 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Henkel, Feiler, Hänzel & Partner Möhlstrasse 37 D-81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91114102.6 | 22.08.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | JP19900259607 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25960790 | JP19910160414 | 01.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16041491 | JP19910026197 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2619791 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477537 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477537 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477537 | Date: | 29.12.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/28, H03K4/00, H03K4/56 | [1997/52] | CPC: |
H03K5/13 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/14] | H03K17/28, H03K4/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1997/28] |
Former [1992/14] | DE, GB, NL | Title | German: | Zeitgeber | [1992/14] | English: | Timing generator | [1992/14] | French: | Générateur de temporisation | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 19.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 14.12.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.02.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.02.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.05.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 16.05.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.09.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.08.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63133071 ; | [A]DE4002328 (ELIN ENERGIEVERSORGUNG [AT]) | [A] - TOUTE L'éLECTRONIQUE no. 545, June 1989, PARIS, FR page 50; 'La Conversion Tension Fréquence' | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 390 (P-772)18 October 1988 & JP-A-63 133 071 ( FUJI ELECTRIC CO LTD. ) 4 June 1988, & JP63133071 A 19880604 |