EP0529122 - Magnetic-field sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 26.06.1998 Database last updated on 10.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.1998 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 12.08.1998 [1998/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pacesetter AB 175 84 Järfälla / SE | [1998/12] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states Pacesetter AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna / SE | ||
Former [1993/09] | For:SE
Siemens Elema AB Röntgenvägen 2 S-171 95 Solna 1 / SE | ||
For:DE
FR
GB
IT
NL
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Högnelid, Kurt Villavägen 30b S-137 38 Västerhanninge / SE | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Bayerstrasse 83 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Harrison, Michael Charles, et al Albihns GmbH, Grasserstrasse 10 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/04] | Lettström, Richard Wilhelm H. Albihns Patentbyra AB, Box 3137 S-103 62 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 91114252.9 | 26.08.1991 | [1993/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529122 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529122 | Date: | 08.11.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/365, A61N1/08, G01R33/028 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
G01R33/0283 (EP,US);
A61N1/36542 (EP,US);
A61N1/37 (EP,US);
A61N1/3718 (EP,US);
Y10S73/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Magnetfelddetektor | [1993/09] | English: | Magnetic-field sensor | [1993/09] | French: | Détecteur de champ magnétique | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/23] | 28.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
08.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE Biotronik GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Christiansen, Henning Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
08.08.1996
ADMISSIBLE Biotronik GmbH & Co Ingenieurbüro Berlin Woermannkehre 1 12359 Berlin / DE Opponent's representative Christiansen, Henning Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Anna-Louisa-Karsch-Strasse 2 10178 Berlin / DE | 09.09.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 05.12.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.03.1998 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 26.03.1998 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1998/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 08.02.1996 | [1996/30] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4186324 (HARTZELL ROBERT E JR [US]); | [A]GB2070937 (ELELCTRONICS LTD M G); | [A]EP0191404 (CORDIS CORP [US]); | [Y]EP0312605 (NEXY KENKYUSHO KK [JP]); | [X]US4887032 (HETRICK ROBERT E [US]); | [A]EP0431437 (SIEMENS ELEMA AB [SE], et al) | [X] - SENSOR AND ACTUATORS. vol. 16, no. 3, 1989, LAUSANNE CH pages 197 - 207; R. E. HETRICK: 'A vibrating cantilever magnetic-field sensor' |