EP0473098 - Glazing beads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.04.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.1995 [1995/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Josef Gartner & Co. Postfach 20/40 D-89421 Gundelfingen / DE | [1992/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schwenkreis, Ludwig Etter 21 W-8886 Wittislingen / DE | [1992/10] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/10] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 D-81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91114298.2 | 26.08.1991 | [1992/10] | Priority number, date | DE19904027335 | 29.08.1990 Original published format: DE 4027335 | [1992/10] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0473098 | Date: | 04.03.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0473098 | Date: | 29.06.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/58 | [1992/10] | CPC: |
E06B3/5828 (EP);
E06B3/5885 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, LU, NL [1992/10] | Title | German: | Halteleistenanordnung für Glasscheiben in Toren | [1992/10] | English: | Glazing beads | [1992/10] | French: | Parcloses | [1992/10] | Examination procedure | 04.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 18.01.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 29.06.1994 | [1995/19] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3031049 (SOMVILLE CHARLES A); | [Y]EP0165026 (TRW INC [US]); | [A]FR2082481 (SABLA WESEP); | [A]DE2428207 (VMW RANSHOFEN BERNDORF AG); | [A]DE3500927 (GLOS GEORG [DE]) |