EP0483476 - A low temperature process for the preparation of isopropenyl-alpha, alpha-dimethyl-benzyl isocyanate-grafted latexes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.1998 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.12.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1300 Wilmington Delaware 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/26] | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1300 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [1995/03] | For all designated states CYTEC TECHNOLOGY CORP. 1105 North Market Street, Suite 1300 Wilmington, Delaware 19801 / US | ||
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states AMERICAN CYANAMID COMPANY 1937 West Main Street P.O. Box 60 Stamford Connecticut 06904-0060 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lucas, Howard Robert 16 Grove Place Danbury, State of Connecticut 06810 / US | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/03] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | ||
Former [1994/08] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr. Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/50] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr. Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/19] | Wächtershäuser, Günter, Prof. Dr. Patentanwalt, Tal 29 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91114321.2 | 27.08.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | US19900609496 | 02.11.1990 Original published format: US 609496 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0483476 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0483476 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483476 | Date: | 25.06.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08F291/00, // (C08F291/00, 212:14) | [1992/19] | CPC: |
C08F291/00 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C08F291/00, C08F212/22 (EP);
C08F291/00, C08F212/26 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Niedrigtemperaturherstellung von Isopropenyl-Alpha,Alphadimethyl-Benzylisocyanat-Pfropflatizes | [1992/19] | English: | A low temperature process for the preparation of isopropenyl-alpha, alpha-dimethyl-benzyl isocyanate-grafted latexes | [1992/19] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation à basse température de latexes greffés d'isopropényl-alpha, alphadiméthyl isocyanate | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 11.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/46] | 12.10.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 22.05.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 09.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 16.12.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.12.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.03.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 26.03.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.06.1997 | BE | 25.06.1997 | CH | 25.06.1997 | DK | 25.06.1997 | GR | 25.06.1997 | LI | 25.06.1997 | NL | 25.06.1997 | LU | 31.08.1997 | SE | 25.09.1997 | [2003/07] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 25.06.1997 | |
BE | 25.06.1997 | ||
CH | 25.06.1997 | ||
DK | 25.06.1997 | ||
GR | 25.06.1997 | ||
LI | 25.06.1997 | ||
LU | 31.08.1997 | ||
SE | 25.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 25.06.1997 | |
BE | 25.06.1997 | ||
CH | 25.06.1997 | ||
DK | 25.06.1997 | ||
LI | 25.06.1997 | ||
SE | 25.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 25.06.1997 | |
BE | 25.06.1997 | ||
CH | 25.06.1997 | ||
LI | 25.06.1997 | ||
SE | 25.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 25.06.1997 | |
BE | 25.06.1997 | ||
CH | 25.06.1997 | ||
LI | 25.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 25.06.1997 | |
CH | 25.06.1997 | ||
LI | 25.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 25.06.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0343289 (TEXACO DEVELOPMENT CORP [US]) |