EP0529127 - Circuit for monitoring the bit rate in ATM-networks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.08.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.10.1997 [1997/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kammerl, Anton, Dr. Weiherweg 3 W-8038 Gröbenzell / DE | [1993/09] | Application number, filing date | 91114393.1 | 27.08.1991 | [1993/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0529127 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529127 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56, H04L12/26 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
H04L12/5602 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5614 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5636 (EP,US);
H04L2012/5637 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/09] | Title | German: | Anordnung zur Bitratenüberwachung in ATM-Netzen | [1993/09] | English: | Circuit for monitoring the bit rate in ATM-networks | [1993/09] | French: | Circuit de surveillance de débit binaire dans des réseaux ATM | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 19.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/41] | 11.12.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 20.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD] - INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF DIGITAL AND ANALOG COMMUNICATION SYSTEMS Bd. 3, 1990, Seiten 187 - 197; G.NIESTEGGE: 'THE 'LEAKY BUCKET' POLICING METHOD IN THE ATM (ASYNCHRONOUS TRANSFER MODE) NETWORK' | [A] - INTERNATIONAL SWITCHING SYMPOSIUM 1990 Bd. 5, Mai 1990, STOCKHOLM SE Seiten 127 - 130; E.P.RATHGEB ET AL.: 'THE POLICING FUNCTION IN ATM NETWORKS' |