EP0517950 - Sorting machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/51] | Variable background for a sorting machine | ||
[1996/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.05.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.07.1997 [1997/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ESM INTERNATIONAL, INC. 10621 Harwin Drive Suite 300 Houston Texas 77036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states ESM INTERNATIONAL, INC. 10621 Harwin Drive Suite 300 Houston Texas 77036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Long, William Coleman 6415 Indigo Houston, Texas 77074 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Frankland, Nigel Howard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91114579.5 | 29.08.1991 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | US19910703501 | 21.05.1991 Original published format: US 703501 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0517950 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0517950 | Date: | 10.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B07C5/342 | [1992/51] | CPC: |
B07C5/342 (EP,US);
B07C5/3425 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/51] | Title | German: | Sortiervorrichtung | [1996/28] | English: | Sorting machine | [1996/28] | French: | Dispositif de tri | [1996/28] |
Former [1992/51] | Veränderlicher Hintergrund für eine Sortiervorrichtung | ||
Former [1992/51] | Variable background for a sorting machine | ||
Former [1992/51] | Arrière-plan variable pour un dispositif de tri | Examination procedure | 14.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/33] | 28.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 08.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 24.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0146299 (GUNSONS SORTEX LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]US4811739 (SILVER ROBERT H [US]); | [A]WO9006819 (GBE INTERNATIONAL PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0115122 (SATAKE ENG CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | US4863041 | EP0146299 | EP0115122 |