EP0474174 - Process for preparing osteogenesis promoting substances [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.03.2010 | Change - representative | published on 14.04.2010 [2010/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP | [1992/40] |
Former [1992/11] | For all designated states TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Notoya, Kohei 39-205, 17 Higashishojaku Settsu, Osaka 566 / JP | 02 /
Yoshida, Keiji 21-3, Daiwanishi 5-chome Kawanishishi, Hyogo 666-01 / JP | 03 /
Yamazaki, Iwao 9-21, Hibarigaokayamate 1-chome Takarazuka, Hyogo 665 / JP | [1992/11] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/15] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1992/11] | von Kreisler, Alek, Dipl.-Chem., et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 91114810.4 | 03.09.1991 | [1992/11] | Priority number, date | JP19900238424 | 06.09.1990 Original published format: JP 23842490 | [1992/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0474174 | Date: | 11.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0474174 | Date: | 27.01.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/00, A61K35/32 | [1993/04] | CPC: |
A61L27/3608 (EP);
A61L27/00 (KR);
A61F2/28 (EP);
A61K35/32 (EP);
A61L27/36 (EP);
A61L27/3683 (EP);
C07K4/12 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1992/11] | A61L27/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/11] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von Osteogenese fördernden Substanzen | [1992/11] | English: | Process for preparing osteogenesis promoting substances | [1992/11] | French: | Procédé pour la préparation de substances stimulateur d'ostéogénèse | [1992/11] | File destroyed: | 29.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 28.07.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/13] | 02.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1994/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.09.1993 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0182483 (COLLAGEN CORP [US]); | [X]US4434094 (SEYEDIN SAEID [US], et al); | [X]US4743259 (BOLANDER MARK E [US], et al); | [X]US4455256 (URIST MARSHALL R [US]); | [A]EP0366029 (YAMAMURO TAKAO [JP]) |