EP0467415 - Post-mix beverage dispenser valve [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 17.11.1992 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.1992 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.01.1993 [1993/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Coca-Cola Company 310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta Georgia 30313 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | For all designated states THE COCA-COLA COMPANY 310 North Avenue, P.O.Box 1734 Atlanta, Georgia 30313 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Whigham, Roger C. 657 Longwood Drive N.W., Atlanta, Georgia 30305 / US | 02 /
Bearden, John H. 3468 Winter Wood Lane Marietta, Georgia 30062 / US | [1992/04] | Representative(s) | Leale, Robin George, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/04] | Leale, Robin George, et al FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 91115446.6 | 03.06.1988 | [1992/04] | Priority number, date | US19870058448 | 05.06.1987 Original published format: US 58448 | [1992/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0467415 | Date: | 22.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/12 | [1992/04] | CPC: |
B67D1/124 (EP,US);
G07F13/00 (KR);
B67D1/0037 (EP,US);
B67D1/1218 (EP,US);
B67D1/1277 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/04] | Title | German: | Postmix-Getränkeabgabeventil | [1992/04] | English: | Post-mix beverage dispenser valve | [1992/04] | French: | Vanne de distribution pour boisson du type post-mix | [1992/04] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/36] | 02.11.1992 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1993/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88305091.6 / EP0294223 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US2587538 (HENRY SEAMAN); | [AD]FR1484745 ; | [A]DE2559323 (DUNGS KARL FA); | [A]US4357972 (VILLA JOSEPH N); | [AD]WO8302935 (SIGNET SCIENT CO [US]) |