EP0531570 - Tape-measure with braking device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SICFO-STANLEY Société industrielle et commerciale française des outils STANLEY B.P. 1579, Rue Jouchoux, Z.I. Trépillot F-25009 Besançon / FR | [1995/38] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states SICFO-STANLEY Société industrielle et commerciale française des outils STANLEY Rue du Zornhoff - Monswiller F-67700 Saverne / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Prouteau, Bernard CIDEX 2 Boite 3, La Belle Etoile F-25320 Montferrand le Château / FR | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91115454.0 | 12.09.1991 | [1993/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0531570 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0531570 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | FR | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01B3/10 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
G01B3/1005 (EP);
G01B2003/101 (EP);
G01B2003/1015 (EP);
G01B2003/1038 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | Rollbandmass mit Aufwickelbremse | [1993/11] | English: | Tape-measure with braking device | [1993/11] | French: | Mesure roulante avec dipositif de freinage | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 06.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/44] | 05.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 19.10.1992 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1992 | 19.10.1992 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1992 | 19.10.1992 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   13.11.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2108930 (ROE INT INC); | [A]GB2114094 (ROE INT INC); | [X]GB2144842 (IRWIN MEASURING TOOL) |