EP0475408 - Magnetostatic wave s/n enhancer and receiving apparatus of fm or pm signal using the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.11.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.01.1997 [1997/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, 2-chome, Jinnan, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/12] | For all designated states NIPPON HOSO KYOKAI 2-1, 2-chome, Jinnan, Shibuya-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nomoto, Toshihiro Shiai Haitsu B-1304, 1223, Yamasakimachi Machida-shi / JP | [1992/12] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/12] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91115478.9 | 12.09.1991 | [1992/12] | Priority number, date | JP19900242741 | 14.09.1990 Original published format: JP 24274190 | JP19900242742 | 14.09.1990 Original published format: JP 24274290 | [1992/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0475408 | Date: | 18.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0475408 | Date: | 24.01.1996 | [1996/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H03H2/00 | [1992/12] | CPC: |
H03H2/001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL, SE [1992/12] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Vergrösserung des Signal-/Rauschverhältnisses von magnetostatischen Wellen und FM- oder PM-Empfangsgerät, das diese Vorrichtung benutzt | [1992/12] | English: | Magnetostatic wave s/n enhancer and receiving apparatus of fm or pm signal using the same | [1992/12] | French: | Dispositif à ondes magnétostatiques d'amélioration du rapport signal/bruit et appareil de réception de signaux FM ou PM l'utilisant | [1992/12] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 12.09.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3875537 (DOLBY RAY MILTON) | [AD] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS. vol. 16, no. 5, September 1980, NEW YORK US pages 1168 - 1170; ADAM: 'A Broadband Microwave Signal to Noise Enhancer' |