EP0476583 - Novel polyamide and process for the production thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.06.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.07.1997 [1997/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | For all designated states MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-5, Kasumigaseki 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitani, Makoto, c/o Mitsui Petrochemical Industries, Ltd., 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | 02 /
Takata, Toshimasa, c/o Mitsui Petrochemical Industries, Ltd., 1-2, Waki 6-chome, Waki-cho Kuga-gun, Yamaguchi-ken / JP | [1992/13] | Representative(s) | Hansen, Bernd, et al Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 81 04 20 81904 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/13] | Hansen, Bernd, Dr. Dipl.-Chem., et al Hoffmann, Eitle & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 81 04 20 D-81904 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91115745.1 | 17.09.1991 | [1992/13] | Priority number, date | JP19900249282 | 19.09.1990 Original published format: JP 24928290 | JP19900408937 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40893790 | JP19900408938 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 40893890 | [1992/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0476583 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0476583 | Date: | 10.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0476583 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08G69/26 | [1992/13] | CPC: |
C08G69/265 (EP,US);
C08G69/26 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/13] | Title | German: | Polyamid und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung | [1992/13] | English: | Novel polyamide and process for the production thereof | [1992/13] | French: | Polyamide et procédé pour sa production | [1992/13] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/32] | 14.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2149539 ; | [AD]JP58065720 ; | [AD]JP2091122 | [A] - DATABASE WPIL Week 9029, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 90-220792 & JP-A-2 149 539 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER), & JP2149539 A 00000000 | [AD] - DATABASE WPIL Week 8321, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 83-50747K & JP-A-58 065 720 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER), & JP58065720 A 00000000 | [AD] - DATABASE WPIL Week 9019, Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 90-144358 & JP-A-2 091 122 (JAPAN SYNTHETIC RUBBER), & JP2091122 A 00000000 |