EP0477756 - Linkable scan lists for a television receiver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.04.1998 [1998/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, INC. 600 North Sherman Drive Indianapolis Indiana 46201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Keenan, Douglas Marvin 505 Tamarack Lane Noblesville, Indiana / US | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Wördemann, Hermes Deutsche Thomson OHG European Patent Operations Karl-Wiechert-Allee 74 30625 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Wördemann, Hermes, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH, Licensing & Intellectual Property, Göttinger Chaussee 76 30453 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [1992/14] | Einsel, Robert, Dipl.-Ing. Deutsche Thomson-Brandt GmbH Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Göttinger Chaussee 76 D-30453 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 91115835.0 | 18.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | US19900589830 | 24.09.1990 Original published format: US 589830 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477756 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477756 | Date: | 14.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477756 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
H04N5/44 (EP,KR,US);
H03J1/0091 (EP,US);
H04N21/4221 (EP,US);
H04N21/4263 (EP,US);
H04N21/482 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1992/14] | Title | German: | Verbindbare Abtastlisten für einen Fernsehempfänger | [1992/14] | English: | Linkable scan lists for a television receiver | [1992/14] | French: | Listes de balayage reliables pour un récepteur de télévision | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 24.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/20] | 15.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.09.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.02.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.02.1997 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 04.03.1997 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Request for further processing for: | 30.06.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 28.06.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.08.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2602930 (STANDARD ELEKTRIK LORENZ AG [DE]); | [A]US4375651 (TEMPLIN FRANK C, et al); | [A]DE3801524 (RCA CORP [US]) | Examination | US4888819 |