EP0477780 - Sheet resist apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.05.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.06.1996 [1996/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ida, Masayuki 592 Banjo-cho Yamato-Koriyama-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kozo 2-3-8-504 Omiya-cho Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 03 /
Okamoto, Yuji 3-404 Arusu-Takanohara, 3-6 Sakyo Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 04 /
Nakayama, Osamu 24-106 Heijo-Dai-Ichi-Danchi, 1-6 Jingu Nara-shi, Nara-ken / JP | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91115951.5 | 19.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | JP19900254705 | 25.09.1990 Original published format: JP 25470590 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477780 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477780 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477780 | Date: | 28.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41J13/00 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
B41J13/0018 (EP,US);
B41J13/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/14] | Title | German: | Blattrückhaltevorrichtung | [1992/14] | English: | Sheet resist apparatus | [1992/14] | French: | Appareil de résistance de feuille | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 10.03.1993 | Examination requested [1993/19] | 23.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62259944 ; | [A]JP59172344 ; | [A]US4884909 (WATANABE YOSHITAKA [JP], et al); | [A]EP0228789 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 141 (M-691)(2988), 28 April 1988; & JP - A - 62259944 (NEC) 12.11.1987, & JP62259944 A 19880428 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 29 (M-356)(1752), 7 February 1985; & JP - A - 59172344 (KONISHIROKU) 29.09.1984, & JP59172344 A 19850207 |