EP0477814 - Dieless compression head and method of crimping [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.1996 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.1996 [1996/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BURNDY CORPORATION Richards Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states Burndy Corporation Richards Avenue Norwalk Connecticut 06856 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ferraro, Neil P. 179 Indian Rock Road Merrimack, NH 03054 / US | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/14] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116128.9 | 23.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | US19900589331 | 27.09.1990 Original published format: US 589331 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477814 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477814 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477814 | Date: | 13.09.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01R43/04, H01R43/042 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
H01R43/042 (EP);
H01R43/04 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | ES, IT [1995/37] |
Former [1995/33] | ES, IT, SE | ||
Former [1992/14] | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE | Title | German: | Matrizenloser Pressverbinderkopf und Crimpverfahren | [1995/37] | English: | Dieless compression head and method of crimping | [1992/14] | French: | Tête de compression sans matrice et méthode de sertissage | [1992/14] |
Former [1992/14] | Stempelloser Pressverbinderkopf und Crimpverfahren | Examination procedure | 09.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 27.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.03.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4136549 (LYTLE THOMAS G, et al); | [A]US2898790 (MICHAEL LAZAR, et al); | [A]US3619885 (DISCHLER HELMUT) |