EP0477818 - Improved oxygen enrichment method and system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 23.07.1999 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1999 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 08.09.1999 [1999/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRAXAIR TECHNOLOGY, INC. 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, CT 06810-5113 / US | [1993/13] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states UNION CARBIDE INDUSTRIAL GASES TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury, Ct. 06817-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kiyonaga, Kazuo 1840-A 9th Avenue Honolulu, HI (96816) / US | 02 /
Litz, Lawrence Marvin 16 Briarwood Lane Pleasantville, NY 10570 / US | 03 /
Bergman, Thomas John 39 Hudson Terrace North Tarrytown, NY 10591 / US | [1995/18] |
Former [1992/14] | 01 /
Kiyonaga, Kazuo 1840-A 9th Avenue Honolulu, Hawaii (96816) / US | ||
02 /
Litz, Lawrence Marvin 16 Briarwood Lane Pleasantville, New York 10570 / US | |||
03 /
Bergman, Thomas John 39 Hudson Terrace North Tarrytown, New York 10591 / US | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116140.4 | 23.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | US19900586945 | 24.09.1990 Original published format: US 586945 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477818 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477818 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0477818 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/18] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0477818 | Date: | 08.09.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/06, B01J10/00 | [1992/14] | CPC: |
B01J19/0066 (EP,US);
C12M1/06 (KR);
B01F23/233 (EP,US);
B01F23/23362 (EP,US);
B01F23/23364 (EP,US);
B01F23/2368 (EP,US);
B01F23/237611 (EP,US);
B01F23/237612 (EP,US);
B01F25/53 (EP,US);
C12M27/02 (EP,US);
C12M29/06 (EP,US);
C12M29/18 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1992/14] | Title | German: | Verbessertes Verfahren und Vorrichtung für Sauerstoffanreicherung | [1992/14] | English: | Improved oxygen enrichment method and system | [1992/14] | French: | Procédé et dispositif amelioré d'enrichissement en oxygene | [1992/14] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/52] | 26.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 30.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1996
15.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Str. 6-14 D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE Opponent's representative Lehner, Thomas (Employee) c/o LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Str. 6-14 D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
01.02.1996
15.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Str. 6-14 D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE Opponent's representative Lehner, Thomas (Employee) c/o LINDE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Zentrale Patentabteilung Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Str. 6-14 D-82049 Höllriegelskreuth / DE | 13.03.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 19.07.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.07.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 01.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 31.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 22.06.1998 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 02.07.1998 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 09.10.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 27.11.1998 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1457571 (GEN ELECTRIC); | [Y]US4169010 (MARWIL STANLEY J); | [A]GB1145561 (RENE PICARD); | [A]US4717669 (FERES VACLAV [DE], et al) | [A] - Research Disclosure, No. 121, May 1974. No. 12103 , pages 6-8: "Super-oxygenation method." |