EP0477883 - Auto voltage selector of inverter power supply [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.04.1995 [1995/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOLDSTAR CO. LTD. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | For all designated states GOLDSTAR CO. Ltd. 20, Yoido-Dong, Youngdungpo-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Min-Ki 4-103, Unah Atp., Kaumjung-Dong Changwon City, Kyungsangnam-Do / KR | [1992/14] | Representative(s) | Cohausz & Florack Patent- & Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Bleichstrasse 14 40211 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/14] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116288.1 | 25.09.1991 | [1992/14] | Priority number, date | KR19150055290 | 28.09.1990 Original published format: KR 1555290 | [1992/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0477883 | Date: | 01.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0477883 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02M1/10 | [1992/27] | CPC: |
H02M1/10 (EP);
H02M3/335 (KR);
H02M7/00 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1992/14] | H02N1/10 | Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [1992/14] | Title | German: | Automatischer Spannungselektor von Wechselrichter-Leistungsversorgung | [1992/14] | English: | Auto voltage selector of inverter power supply | [1992/14] | French: | Autosélecteur de tension d'une alimentation de puissance à onduleur | [1992/14] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 11.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.10.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/16] | 22.11.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE3821987 (HENGSTLER GMBH [DE]); | [A]US4937731 (KONOPKA JOHN G [US]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 013, no. 220 (E-762)23 May 1989 & JP-1 031 390 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC ) 1 February 1989 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 4, no. 189 (E-39)(671) 25 December 1980 & JP-55 131 272 ( TOUKOU ) 11 October 1980 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 110 (E-728)16 March 1989 & JP-63 281 389 ( MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC ) 17 November 1988 |