EP0479110 - An equipment and process for the production of open-top containers and related containers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.1993 [1993/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BINI & C. S.r.l. 1, Via Sabattini I-40050 Monte S. Pietro (Bologna) / IT | [1992/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bini, Anselmo 1, via Sabattini I-40050 Monte S. Pietro (Bologna) / IT | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Marietti, Giuseppe Marietti, Gislon e Trupiano S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Marietti, Giuseppe MARIETTI e GISLON S.r.l. Via Larga, 16 I-20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91116339.2 | 25.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | IT19900021623 | 02.10.1990 Original published format: IT 2162390 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0479110 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0479110 | Date: | 01.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B31B3/46 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
B31B50/00 (EP);
B31B50/28 (EP,US);
B31B50/46 (EP);
B31B50/60 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/15] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung von oben offenen Behältern und Behälter | [1992/15] | English: | An equipment and process for the production of open-top containers and related containers | [1992/15] | French: | Equipement et procédé pour la fabrication des récipients ouverts à leur face supérieure et récipients | [1992/15] | File destroyed: | 23.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 05.01.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/43] | 27.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE68958 ; | [Y]GB225594 (SARANAC AUTOMATIC MACHINE CORP); | [A]US1534569 (CHARLES BUTTERFIELD); | [A]FR2226844 (SIEMCO SA [FR], et al); | [Y]GB2103145 (METAL BOX PLC [GB]); | [A]US4522618 (STANNARD CHARLES G [US]) |