EP0491121 - Movable video camera for surveillance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.01.1997 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.01.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.02.1997 [1997/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong Paldal-gu Suwon-City, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan 3-Dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do 441-370 / KR | ||
Former [1995/37] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO., LTD. 416 Maetan 3-dong, Paldal-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | ||
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD. 416 Maetan-Dong, Kwonsun-gu Suwon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Seung Lyul, c/o Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. 416, Maetan-dong, Kwonsun-gu Suweon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | [1996/09] |
Former [1992/26] | 01 /
Choi, Seung Lyul, c/o Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. 41, Maetan-dong, Kwonsun-gu Suweon-city, Kyungki-do / KR | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116424.2 | 26.09.1991 | [1992/26] | Priority number, date | KR19710000790 | 15.12.1990 Original published format: KR 2071790 | [1992/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0491121 | Date: | 24.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0491121 | Date: | 28.02.1996 | [1996/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G08B13/196, H04N7/18 | [1992/26] | CPC: |
G08B13/19669 (EP,US);
H04N7/185 (KR);
G03B17/561 (KR);
G08B13/19623 (EP,US);
G08B13/19695 (EP,US);
H04N5/782 (KR);
H04N7/183 (EP,US);
H05K7/183 (KR);
H01H2231/046 (KR);
Y10S388/908 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1995/37] |
Former [1992/26] | DE, FR, GB | Title | German: | Bewegbare Videokamera zur Überwachung | [1992/26] | English: | Movable video camera for surveillance | [1992/26] | French: | Caméra vidéo mobile pour la surveillance | [1992/26] | Examination procedure | 26.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 27.03.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4120004 (COUTTA JOHN M); | [A]US4510526 (COUTTA JOHN M [US], et al); | [A]FR2633134 (BOUCHER BERNARD [FR], et al) |