EP0479146 - Use of propylene glycol monomethyl ether for dry cleaning [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/15] | Solvent for dry cleaning | ||
[1996/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.10.1997 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.10.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.12.1997 [1997/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MIHAMA CORPORATION 3-3 Akasaka 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states MIHAMA CORPORATION 3-3 Akasaka 3-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kazama, Ken 1-4-504, Midori-cho Ashiya-shi, Hyogo-ken / JP | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Büchel, Kurt F. Kaminski Harmann Patentanwälte AG Landstrasse 124 9490 Vaduz / LI | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Büchel, Kurt F., Dr. Patentbüro Büchel & Partner AG Letzanaweg 25-27 FL-9495 Triesen / LI | Application number, filing date | 91116518.1 | 27.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | JP19900263002 | 02.10.1990 Original published format: JP 26300290 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0479146 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0479146 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479146 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D06L1/02, C11D7/50 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
D06L1/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/15] | C11D7/50 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | Verwendung von Propylenglykolmonomethylether zur Trockenreinigung | [1996/51] | English: | Use of propylene glycol monomethyl ether for dry cleaning | [1996/51] | French: | Utilisation de propylène glycol monomethyl ether pour le nettoyage à sec | [1996/51] |
Former [1992/15] | Lösungsmittel für die Trockenreinigung | ||
Former [1992/15] | Solvent for dry cleaning | ||
Former [1992/15] | Solvent pour le nettoyage à sec | Examination procedure | 03.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/26] | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.06.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.09.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.08.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62201977 ; | [X]JP61293274 ; | [A]US3701627 ; | [A]FR1544834 | [X] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; DATABASE WPIL, accession no. 87-288557, week 8741; & JP - A - 62201977 (TOYO INK MFG KK et al.) 05.09.1987, & JP62201977 A 00000000 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 163 (C-424)(2610), 26 May 1987; & JP - A - 61293274 (RICOH CO LTD) 24.12.1986, & JP61293274 A 19870526 | [A] - JOURNAL OF RADIATION CURING vol. 15, no. 2, April 1988, pages 3-7; M.R. ADAMCHUK et al.: "Propylene-Based Glycol Ethers and Acetates as Substitutes for Methylene Chloride in Solvent Applications" |