EP0536430 - Process for the power supply of a remote control, e.g. for a car lock system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.12.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.01.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 03.03.2004 [2004/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/15] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 D-80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Seubert, Tilmann, Dipl.-Ing. 16, allée de la Nièvre F - 31770 Coloniers / FR | [1997/08] |
Former [1993/15] | 01 /
Seubert, Tilmann, Dipl.-Ing. 16, allé de la Nièvre F - 31770 Coloniers / FR | Application number, filing date | 91116713.8 | 30.09.1991 | [1993/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0536430 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0536430 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04B10/00, E05B49/00 | [1993/15] | CPC: |
H04B10/807 (EP);
B60R25/406 (EP);
G07C9/00309 (EP);
G07C2009/00603 (EP);
G07C2009/00769 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Energieversorgung eines fernsteuernden Handsenders, z.B. für ein Kfz-Schliesssystem | [1993/15] | English: | Process for the power supply of a remote control, e.g. for a car lock system | [1993/15] | French: | Procédé pour desservir une télécommande en énergie p.e. pour un système de verrouillage pour automobile | [1993/15] | Examination procedure | 30.10.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.10.1991 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, CH, DK, ES, IT, LI, LU, NL | 30.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) BE | 30.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) GR | 07.05.1993 | Examination requested [1993/27] | 05.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.08.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.11.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 04.11.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.11.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 04.11.1992 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 04.11.1992 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.02.1997 | GR | 19.02.1997 | NL | 19.02.1997 | DK | 19.05.1997 | SE | 19.05.1997 | CH | 30.09.1997 | LI | 30.09.1997 | [2004/10] |
Former [2003/47] | AT | 19.02.1997 | |
GR | 19.02.1997 | ||
DK | 19.05.1997 | ||
SE | 19.05.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 19.02.1997 | |
GR | 19.02.1997 | ||
SE | 19.05.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1999/36] | AT | 19.02.1997 | |
SE | 19.05.1997 | ||
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/45] | SE | 19.05.1997 | |
CH | 30.09.1997 | ||
LI | 30.09.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | SE | 19.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0307749 ; | [Y]DE3446245 ; | [A]WO9114065 |