EP0479288 - Water-in-oil emulsion composition for bakery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-35, Higashi-Ogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states ASAHI DENKA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-35, Higashi-Ogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanaka, Shinji, c/o Asahi Denka Kogyo K.K. 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Okutomi, Yasuo, c/o Asahi Denka Kogyo K.K. 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Endo, Amane, c/o Asahi Denka Kogyo K.K. 2-35, Higashiogu 7-chome Arakawa-ku, Tokyo / JP | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91116867.2 | 02.10.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | JP19900267427 | 04.10.1990 Original published format: JP 26742790 | [1992/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0479288 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0479288 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479288 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A21D2/16, A23D7/00 | [1992/39] | CPC: |
A21D2/16 (EP,US);
A23D7/011 (EP,US);
A23D7/013 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/15] | A23D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/15] | Title | German: | Wasser-in-Öl-Emulsionen zur Herstellung von Bäckereiprodukten | [1992/15] | English: | Water-in-oil emulsion composition for bakery | [1992/15] | French: | Emulsions eau-dans-l'huile pour la fabrication de produits de boulangerie | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 08.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/14] | 20.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.1996 | BE | 03.01.1996 | CH | 03.01.1996 | DK | 03.01.1996 | ES | 03.01.1996 | GR | 03.01.1996 | LI | 03.01.1996 | SE | 03.04.1996 | [2002/25] |
Former [2000/05] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
CH | 03.01.1996 | ||
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
GR | 03.01.1996 | ||
LI | 03.01.1996 | ||
SE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
CH | 03.01.1996 | ||
DK | 03.01.1996 | ||
LI | 03.01.1996 | ||
SE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
CH | 03.01.1996 | ||
LI | 03.01.1996 | ||
SE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/51] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
BE | 03.01.1996 | ||
SE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | AT | 03.01.1996 | |
SE | 03.04.1996 | ||
Former [1996/38] | SE | 03.04.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63037615 ; | [Y]JP57083256 ; | [Y]JP59146532 ; | [A]US4424237 (WITTMAN III JAMES S [US]); | [A]US4732767 (SEIDEN PAUL [US], et al); | [Y]EP0350983 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) | [Y] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Section Ch, Week 8833, 1988 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D, AN 82-53898E & JP-A-63 037 615 (NIPPON OILS & FATS KK), & JP63037615 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 169 2 September 1982 & JP-A-57 083 256 ( NIPPON OIL & FATS CO LTD ), & JP57083256 A 19820902 | [Y] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Section Ch, Week 8440, 1984 Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; Class D, AN 84-245868 & JP-A-59 146 532 (UEDA SEIYU KK), & JP59146532 A 00000000 |