EP0486795 - Credit card transaction form set [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states MOORE BUSINESS FORMS, INC. 300 Lang Boulevard Grand Island New York 14072-1697 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McCartney, Larry G. 30 Shawnee Drive Buckhannon, West Virginia 26201 / US | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Spence, Anne, et al Fry, Heath & Spence St. Georges House 6 Yattendon Road Horley Surrey RH6 7BS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Spence, Anne, et al Fry, Heath & Spence St. Georges House 6 Yattendon Road Horley Surrey RH6 7BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 91116894.6 | 04.10.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | US19900615171 | 19.11.1990 Original published format: US 615171 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486795 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486795 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41L1/22 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
B41L1/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1992/22] | Title | German: | Transaktionsformularsatz für Kreditkarte | [1992/22] | English: | Credit card transaction form set | [1992/22] | French: | Liasse de transaction pour carte de crédit | [1992/22] | Examination procedure | 02.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/45] | 28.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 28.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.12.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0257885 (MOORE BUSINESS FORMS INC [US]); | [A]WO8704981 (NEP GREGORY A); | [A]US4741558 (LOUIS JOE N [US]) |