EP0480345 - Eddy-current brake [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PENTAR S.A. Autovia de Logrono Km. 13.700, Poligono S. Ildefonso, Nave 1 E-50180 Utebo - Zaragoza / ES | [1992/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taules, Carlos Maria Calle La Paz, 17 E-31579 Carcar - Navarra / ES | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Müller, Eckhard Mühlstrasse 9a 65597 Hünfelden-Dauborn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Müller, Eckhard, Dr. Eifelstrasse 14 D-65597 Hünfelden / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117034.8 | 04.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | DE19904031269 | 04.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4031269 | [1992/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0480345 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H02K49/04 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
H02K49/046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL [1992/16] | Title | German: | Wirbelstrombremse | [1992/16] | English: | Eddy-current brake | [1992/16] | French: | Frein à courants de Foucault | [1992/16] | File destroyed: | 17.08.2001 | Examination procedure | 16.10.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/23] | 19.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1993/23] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR1454516 ; | [Y]DE2650147 ; | [Y]US4457182 ; | [Y]FR1507286 ; | [A]US2836742 ; | [AD]DE9000789U |