EP0489240 - Endoscopic adapter with lamina interface [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.1997 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.06.1997 [1997/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEDICAL CONCEPTS INCORPORATED University Business Center, 175B Cremona Drive Goleta California 93117 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/24] | For all designated states MEDICAL CONCEPTS INCORPORATED University Business Center, 175B Cremona Drive Goleta, California 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chatenever, David 1615 Loma Street Santa Barbara, California 93103 / US | 02 /
Mattsson-Boze, Daniel H. 480 Whitman Apartment 90 Goleta, California 93117 / US | [1992/32] |
Former [1992/24] | 01 /
Chatenever, David 1615 Loma Street Santa Barbara, California 93103 / US | ||
02 /
Mattsson-Boze, Daniel H. 223 Elwood Beach Drive Nr. 3 Goleta, California 93117 / US | Representative(s) | Müller, Frithjof E. Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/13] | Müller, Frithjof E., Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwälte MÜLLER & HOFFMANN, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/24] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117053.8 | 07.10.1991 | [1992/24] | Priority number, date | US19900621574 | 03.12.1990 Original published format: US 621574 | [1992/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0489240 | Date: | 10.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0489240 | Date: | 03.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00, A61B1/04, G03B17/48 | [1992/24] | CPC: |
A61B1/04 (EP,US);
G03B17/48 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/24] | Title | German: | Endoskopischer Adapter mit Zwischenschicht | [1992/24] | English: | Endoscopic adapter with lamina interface | [1992/24] | French: | Adaptateur endoscopique avec lamelle d'interface | [1992/24] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/24] | 16.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.08.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4600940 (SLUYTER ERIK [US]); | [A]DE8711421U ; | [A]US4756304 (WATANABE ROBERT S [US]); | [AD]EP0324657 (MEDICAL CONCEPTS INC [US]) |