EP0480432 - Modification device for string instrument pickup [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.08.1997 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lace, Mildred A. Mount Prospect County of Cook Illinois / US | For all designated states Dorn, Thomas E. Clarendon Hills County of DuPage Illinois / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | For all designated states Lace, Mildred A. Mount Prospect County of Cook, Illinois / US | ||
For all designated states Dorn, Thomas E. Clarendon Hills County of DuPage, Illinois / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lace, Melvin A. 3 Garden Court Prospect Heights, Illinois 60070 / US | [1992/16] | Representative(s) | Heusler, Wolfgang, et al V. Bezold & Partner Patentanwälte - PartG mbB Akademiestrasse 7 80799 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/16] | Heusler, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Ing., et al Dr. Dieter von Bezold Dipl.-Ing. Peter Schütz Dipl.-Ing. Wolfgang Heusler Brienner Strasse 52 D-80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117311.0 | 10.10.1991 | [1992/16] | Priority number, date | US19900597899 | 10.10.1990 Original published format: US 597899 | US19910764346 | 23.09.1991 Original published format: US 764346 | [1992/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0480432 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0480432 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0480432 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G10H3/18 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
G10H3/181 (EP);
G10H2220/515 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/16] | Title | German: | Modifikationsvorrichtung für Tonabnehmer eines Saiteninstruments | [1996/39] | English: | Modification device for string instrument pickup | [1992/16] | French: | Dispositif modificateur pour capteur d'instrument à cordes | [1992/16] |
Former [1992/16] | Wandelvorrichtung für das Mirkophon eines Saiteninstruments | Examination procedure | 25.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/03] | 21.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 25.09.1996 | FR | 25.09.1996 | IT | 25.09.1996 | NL | 25.09.1996 | GB | 25.12.1996 | DE | 28.12.1996 | [2004/35] |
Former [2003/07] | ES | 25.09.1996 | |
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
NL | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.12.1996 | ||
DE | 28.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [2002/25] | ES | 25.09.1996 | |
IT | 25.09.1996 | ||
GB | 25.12.1996 | ||
DE | 28.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 25.09.1996 | |
GB | 25.12.1996 | ||
DE | 28.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1998/05] | GB | 25.12.1996 | |
DE | 28.12.1996 | ||
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/34] | DE | 28.12.1996 | |
FR | 21.02.1997 | ||
Former [1997/29] | DE | 28.12.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4320681 ; | [A]GB1396824 ; | [A]US3983777 ; | [A]US4809578 |