EP0493656 - Switch position sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1996 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.03.1996 [1996/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 88662 Überlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | For all designated states Bodenseewerk Gerätetechnik GmbH Alte Nussdorfer Strasse 15 Postfach 1120 D-88662 Überlingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Boos, Franz Karl Kasernenstrasse 63 W-7760 Radolfzell / DE | [1995/14] |
Former [1992/28] | 01 /
Boos, Franz Karl Kasernenstrasse 63 W-7760 Radlfzell / DE | Representative(s) | Weisse, Jürgen, et al Weisse & Wolgast Bleibtraustrasse 38 10623 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/28] | Weisse, Jürgen, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, et al Fuggerstrasse 26 D-10777 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117441.5 | 12.10.1991 | [1992/28] | Priority number, date | DE19904042302 | 31.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4042302 | [1992/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0493656 | Date: | 08.07.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0493656 | Date: | 14.04.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0493656 | Date: | 05.04.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/16, B64C13/00, H03K17/968 | [1995/14] | CPC: |
B64C13/00 (EP);
H01H9/168 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/28] | H01H9/16, B64C13/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/28] | Title | German: | Schaltstellungssensor | [1992/28] | English: | Switch position sensor | [1992/28] | French: | Capteur de position de commutation | [1992/28] | Examination procedure | 11.08.1993 | Examination requested [1993/40] | 20.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0162376 (RUHRTAL GMBH [DE]); | [A]US3475676 (HUTSON JEARLD L) |