EP0481390 - Backwash method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.09.1994 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Graver Company 2720 U.S. Highway 22 Union New Jersey 07083 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states The Graver Company 2720 U.S. Highway 22 Union New Jersey 07083 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ryan, Leo 1344 Plymouth Road Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Strehl Schübel-Hopf Groening & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117459.7 | 14.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | US19900598540 | 16.10.1990 Original published format: US 598540 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481390 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B01D29/11, B01D29/52, B01D29/66 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
B01D29/114 (EP,US);
B01D29/52 (EP);
B01D29/661 (EP);
B01D29/92 (EP);
B01D2201/0446 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
B01D29/114, B01D29/52, B01D29/661, B01D29/92 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1992/17] | Title | German: | Rückspülverfahren und Anlage | [1992/17] | English: | Backwash method and apparatus | [1992/17] | French: | Méthode de rinçage à contre-courant et dispositif | [1992/17] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 21.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 03.05.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/44] | 03.06.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1994/44] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE2803756 (FILTROX MASCHINENBAU AG); | [Y]US3414129 (GOING LOUIS H, et al); | [Y]CH306366 (ZDANSKY EWALD A [CH]); | [Y]GB2067910 (SCHNEIDER CO INC J R); | [A]DE2409768 (BAMAG VERFAHRENSTECHNIK GMBH) |