EP0481406 - Process for the metathesis of partially fluorinated hydrocarbons [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT 65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states HOECHST AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
von Werner, Konrad, Dr. Wehrstrasse 6 W-8268 Garching / DE | 02 /
Weiss, Karin, Dr. Tizianweg 3 W-8580 Bayreuth / DE | [1992/17] | Application number, filing date | 91117495.1 | 14.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | DE19904032896 | 17.10.1990 Original published format: DE 4032896 | [1992/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481406 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481406 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C6/04, C07C21/18 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
C07C17/00 (EP,US);
C07C21/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/17] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Metathese teilweise fluorierter Kohlenwasserstoffe | [1992/17] | English: | Process for the metathesis of partially fluorinated hydrocarbons | [1992/17] | French: | Procédé de métathèse d'hydrocarbures partiellement fluorés | [1992/17] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 09.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0191675 (ELF AQUITAINE [FR]); | [A]EP0276096 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0218138 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]) | Examination | EP0373488 |