EP0481442 - Tumbler type washing/drying machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/17] | Tumbler type washing/drying machine and method of controlling the same | ||
[1995/34] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka 545 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Akabane, Tatuo 9-540, Shimizu-cho Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Kitamura, Susumu 743-3, Shimomatsu-cho Kishiwada-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Niinai, Kazuhide 1-7-13-302, Sanmei-cho Abeno-ku, Osaka / JP | 04 /
Nagata, Hiroaki 608-4, Koizumi-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara-ken / JP | 05 /
Kajita, Yoshiaki 12-13-5, Nagamodai, Kamo-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto / JP | 06 /
Yamane, Koji 2-449-1-405, Hirano Kashiwara-shi, Osaka / JP | 07 /
Noguchi, Takeo 832-58, Misato, Heguri-cho Ikoma-gun, Naran-ken / JP | [1996/06] |
Former [1992/17] | 01 /
Akabane, Tatuo 9-540, Shimizu-cho Tondabayashi-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
02 /
Kitamura, Susumu 743-3, Shimomatsu-cho Kishiwada-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
03 /
Niinai, Kanzuhide 1-7-13-302, Sanmei-cho Abeno-ku, Osaka / JP | |||
04 /
Nagata, Hiroaki 608-4, Koizumi-cho Yamatokoriyama-shi, Nara-ken / JP | |||
05 /
Kajita, Yoshiaki 12-13-5, Nagamodai, Kamo-cho Soraku-gun, Kyoto / JP | |||
06 /
Yamane, Koji 2-449-1-405, Hirano Kashiwara-shi, Osaka / JP | |||
07 /
Noguchi, Takeo 832-58, Misato, Heguri-cho Ikoma-gun, Naran-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Nymphenburger Strasse 4 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | TER MEER - MÜLLER - STEINMEISTER & PARTNER Mauerkircherstrasse 45 D-81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117635.2 | 15.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | JP19900278650 | 16.10.1990 Original published format: JP 27865090 | JP19900415986 | 28.12.1990 Original published format: JP 41598690 | JP19910047254 | 25.01.1991 Original published format: JP 4725491 | JP19910018953 | 12.02.1991 Original published format: JP 1895391 | JP19910022267 | 15.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2226791 | JP19910026428 | 20.02.1991 Original published format: JP 2642891 | JP19910088883 | 20.04.1991 Original published format: JP 8888391 | JP19910145734 | 18.06.1991 Original published format: JP 14573491 | JP19910159042 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: JP 15904291 | JP19910164692 | 04.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16469291 | JP19910164693 | 04.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16469391 | JP19910165910 | 05.07.1991 Original published format: JP 16591091 | JP19910182658 | 23.07.1991 Original published format: JP 18265891 | JP19910190328 | 30.07.1991 Original published format: JP 19032891 | JP19910200218 | 09.08.1991 Original published format: JP 20021891 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0481442 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0481442 | Date: | 19.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481442 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.07.1992 | Classification | IPC: | D06F25/00, D06F37/40, D06F39/04, D06F58/24, D06F37/30, D06F58/28, D06F35/00 | [1992/34] | CPC: |
D06F35/005 (EP,US);
D06F37/40 (EP,US);
D06F25/00 (EP,US);
D06F37/304 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/17] | D06F25/00, D06F37/40, D06F39/04, D06F58/24, D06F37/30, D06F35/00, D06F58/28 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/17] | Title | German: | Trommelwaschmaschine/-trockner | [1995/34] | English: | Tumbler type washing/drying machine | [1995/34] | French: | Machine à laver/à sécher à tambour | [1995/34] |
Former [1992/17] | Trommelwaschmaschine/-trockner und Steuerungsverfahren | ||
Former [1992/17] | Tumbler type washing/drying machine and method of controlling the same | ||
Former [1992/17] | Machine à laver/à sécher à tambour et procédé de commande | Examination procedure | 01.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/49] | 06.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 17.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0390011 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]JPS6121476U |