EP0482496 - Machine for machining edges, particularly of glass plates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.1996 [1996/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Z. BAVELLONI S.p.A. Via Milano 73 I-22070 Bregnano (Como) / IT | [1992/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bavelloni, Franco Via Mazzini 7 I-22070 Appiano Gentile Como / IT | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16 I-20123 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 91117650.1 | 16.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | IT19900021815 | 22.10.1990 Original published format: IT 2181590 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482496 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482496 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B24B9/10, B24B41/06, B65G37/00 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
B24B41/068 (EP,US);
B24B9/102 (EP,US);
B65G37/005 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/18] | Title | German: | Kantenbearbeitungsmaschine, insbesondere für Glasscheiben | [1992/18] | English: | Machine for machining edges, particularly of glass plates | [1992/18] | French: | Machine pour l'usinage des arêtes, en particulier de plaque de verre | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 07.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/51] | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4537301 (BAVELLONI FRANCO [IT]); | [A]FR2571645 (BANDO KIKO CO [JP]); | [X]DE3821287 (A D A S A S DI GARIGLIO CLAUDI [IT]) |