EP0481491 - Laser power conrol apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.11.1996 | Opposition rejected | published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TEC 570 Ohito, Ohito-cho, Tagata-gun Shizuoka 410-2392 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/01] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha TEC 570 Ohito, Ohito-cho, Tagata-gun Shizuoka / JP | ||
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-13, 2-chome, Nakameguro Meguro-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oku Juntaro 3016-17-203, Shimokanukiushibuse Numazu-shi, Shizuoka-ken / JP | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Weber, Joachim, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | Weber, Joachim, Dr., et al Hoefer, Schmitz, Weber Patentanwälte Ludwig-Ganghofer-Strasse 20 D-82031 Grünwald / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117757.4 | 17.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | JP19900276481 | 17.10.1990 Original published format: JP 27648190 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0481491 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0481491 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481491 | Date: | 07.09.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.04.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H01S3/103, H04N1/40 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
H01S3/10 (KR);
H01S5/06209 (EP);
H04N1/40037 (EP);
H01S5/0617 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/17] | H01S3/103 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1992/17] | Title | German: | Gerät zur Steuerung der Laserleistung | [1992/17] | English: | Laser power conrol apparatus | [1992/17] | French: | Appareil de commande de puissance d'un laser | [1992/17] | Examination procedure | 17.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/17] | 09.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 31.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 25.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1995
11.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. Corporate Intellectual Property and Legal Headquarters 30-2, Shimomaruko 3- chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Pellmann, Hans-Bernd Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1995/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1995
11.07.1995
ADMISSIBLE Canon Inc. Corporate Intellectual Property and Legal Headquarters 30-2, Shimomaruko 3- chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP Opponent's representative Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/31] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.06.1995
Canon Inc. Corporate Intellectual Property and Legal Headquarters 30-2, Shimomaruko 3- chome, Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | 14.07.1995 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.11.1995 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.07.1996 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 03.08.1996 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2071572 ; | [A]EP0358171 (CANON KK [JP]); | [A]EP0287360 (SHARP KK [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 14, no. 248 (E-933)(4191) 28 May 1990 & JP-A-2 071 572 ( CANON INC. ), & JP2071572 A 19900528 |