EP0494347 - Sorter incorporating a stapler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.04.1997 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.05.1997 [1997/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | For all designated states MITA INDUSTRIAL CO. LTD. 2-28, 1-chome, Tamatsukuri Higashi-ku Osaka 540 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohata, Yousuke 7-14-401, Hannan-cho, 2-chome, Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | 02 /
Hashimoto, Yukio 5-13-202, Deguchi 3-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 03 /
Sakagami, Hidekazu, Motoyama Century Mansion 417, 11-19, Tanaka-cho 2-chome Higashinada-ku, Kobe-shi, Hyogo / JP | 04 /
Nishimura, Toshinori 5-1-326, Fujisakahigashi-machi 3-chome Hirakata-shi, Osaka / JP | 05 /
Nagao, Tsuyoshi, Taihou-Midoribashi CT Square 413, 17-8,Higashinakamoto 1-chome Higashinari-ku, Osaka-shi, Osaka / JP | [1992/29] | Representative(s) | Sajda, Wolf E., et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/29] | Sajda, Wolf E., Dipl.-Phys., et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Widenmayerstrasse 48 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117769.9 | 17.10.1991 | [1992/29] | Priority number, date | JP19900282998 | 19.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28299890 | [1992/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0494347 | Date: | 15.07.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0494347 | Date: | 22.05.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B65H33/14 | [1992/29] | CPC: |
G03G15/6541 (EP);
B42C1/125 (EP);
B65H39/11 (EP);
B65H9/101 (EP);
B65H2403/511 (EP);
B65H2408/113 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/29] | Title | German: | Sortiereinheit, einen Stapler enthaltend | [1992/29] | English: | Sorter incorporating a stapler | [1992/29] | French: | Appareil classeur contenant un dispositif d'empilage | [1992/29] | Miscellaneous | EPB 1996/21: Teilanmeldung 94116170.5 eingereicht am 17/10/91 | EPB 1996/21: Divisional application 94116170.5 filed on 17/10/91 | EPB 1996/21: Demande divisionnaire 94116170.5 déposée le 17/10/91 | Examination procedure | 20.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/38] | 17.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.02.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.06.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.11.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP94116170.5 / EP0636499 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JPH01231757 ; | [AD]JPH0223154 ; | [AD]JPS63165270 ; | [AD]JPS60179756 ; | [A]US4385827 ; | [A]US4928150 |