EP0481523 - Reduced calory fat mimetics comprising esterified propoxylated monoglycerides and diglycerides [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.1996 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.09.2008 | Change - representative | published on 15.10.2008 [2008/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CPC INTERNATIONAL INC. International Plaza P.O. Box 8000 Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/17] | For all designated states CPC INTERNATIONAL INC. International Plaza P.O. Box 8000 Englewood Cliffs New Jersey 07632-9976 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sekula, Bernard C. 25 A Sylvan Road High Bridge, New Jersey 08829 / US | [1992/17] | Representative(s) | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Lederer, Franz, et al Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/17] | Lederer, Franz, Dr., et al Lederer, Keller & Riederer Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 16 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91117855.6 | 18.10.1991 | [1992/17] | Priority number, date | US19900601170 | 19.10.1990 Original published format: US 601170 | [1992/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0481523 | Date: | 22.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0481523 | Date: | 09.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C69/30, C07C69/52, A23D7/00, A23D9/00 | [1992/17] | CPC: |
C07C69/52 (EP,US);
A23L33/20 (KR);
C07C69/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/17] | Title | German: | Fettsurrogate mit niedrigem Kaloriengehalt bestehend aus propoxylierten Monoglyceriden und Diglyceriden | [1992/17] | English: | Reduced calory fat mimetics comprising esterified propoxylated monoglycerides and diglycerides | [1992/17] | French: | Substituts de graisse à teneur en calories réduite comprenant des monoglycérides et diglycérides propoxylés | [1992/17] | Examination procedure | 23.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/47] | 26.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.05.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 04.05.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0254547 (ATLANTIC RICHFIELD CO [US]); | [X]EP0325010 (ARCO CHEM TECH [US]) |