EP0482607 - Process of producing 2-aminothiazole [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.07.1997 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.08.1997 [1997/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 9-11, Horidome-cho, 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | For all designated states KUREHA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD. 9-11, Horidome-cho, 1-chome Nihonbashi Chuo-ku Tokyo 103 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wakasugi, Takashi 28-1, Nishikimachi Ochiai Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Miyakawa, Tadashi 71-3, Niidamachi Karasuuchi Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | 03 /
Tonouchi, Naka 55-1, Nishikimachi Sekishita Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | 04 /
Yamauchi, Takashi 61-6, Nishikimachi Egurimae Iwaki-shi, Fukushima-ken / JP | [1992/18] | Representative(s) | Boeters, Hans Dietrich BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/18] | Boeters, Hans Dietrich, Dr. Patentanwälte Boeters & Bauer, Bereiteranger 15 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118067.7 | 23.10.1991 | [1992/18] | Priority number, date | JP19900287582 | 25.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28758290 | [1992/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0482607 | Date: | 29.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0482607 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07D277/40 | [1992/18] | CPC: |
C07D277/40 (EP);
C07C45/55 (EP)
| C-Set: |
C07C45/55, C07C47/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1992/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von 2-Aminothiazole | [1992/18] | English: | Process of producing 2-aminothiazole | [1992/18] | French: | Procédé de préparation de 2-amino thiazole | [1992/18] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1991 | Examination requested [1992/18] | 18.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.10.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.02.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 27.02.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.06.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH283422 ; | [AD]EP0368613 | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 51, no. 21, 10 November 1957, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 16560H, column 16560 ; | Examination | SU106446 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 51, no. 21, 10 November 1957, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 16560H, column 16560; & SU-A-106 446, & SU106446 A 00000000 |