EP0483695 - Resin composition and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.1997 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.09.1997 [1997/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Gohsei Kagaku Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha No 9-6, Nozaki-cho, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | For all designated states Nippon Gohsei Kagaku Kogyo Kabushiki Kaisha No 9-6, Nozaki-cho, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka-fu / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takida, Hiroshi 5-34-13, Miyanogawara Takatsuki-shi, Osaka 569 / JP | 02 /
Uemura, Tomoyoshi Okachiyama Heights, 7-24, Minohara 3-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567 / JP | 03 /
Honda, Hiroyuki 21-331, Korai 2-chome, Oiso-cho Naka-gun, Kanagawa 255 / JP | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Türk, Gille, Hrabal, Leifert Brucknerstrasse 20 D-40593 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118271.5 | 26.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | JP19900293070 | 29.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29307090 | JP19900293071 | 29.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29307190 | JP19900293072 | 29.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29307290 | JP19900293073 | 29.10.1990 Original published format: JP 29307390 | [1992/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0483695 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0483695 | Date: | 23.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0483695 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L29/04, B32B27/28, // (C08L29/04, 23:02, 51:06) | [1992/39] | CPC: |
B32B27/28 (EP);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/20 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
C08K3/22 (EP);
C08L23/02 (EP);
C08L23/0861 (EP);
C08L23/26 (EP);
C08L29/04 (EP);
C08L77/00 (EP);
B32B2307/516 (US);
C08K2003/2206 (EP);
C08K2003/2217 (EP);
C08K2003/2227 (EP);
C08K2003/2296 (EP);
C08K2003/262 (EP);
C08K3/26 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L2205/035 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0861, C08L23/12, C08L51/06 (EP);
C08L29/04, C08K3/22, C08L23/02, C08L23/26, C08L77/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [1992/19] | B32B27/28, C08L29/04, // (C08L29/04, 23:02, 51:06) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1992/19] | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzung und ihre Verwendung | [1992/19] | English: | Resin composition and use thereof | [1992/19] | French: | Composition de résine et son utilisation | [1992/19] | Examination procedure | 01.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/19] | 03.05.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.11.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.04.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.07.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP62011748 ; | [A]GB2185986 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND); | [X]WO9012063 (NESTE OY [FI]); | [XP]EP0440557 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]); | [XP]EP0440558 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]); | [XP]EP0440535 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]); | [XP]EP0440559 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]); | [XP]EP0440560 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]); | [XP]EP0444977 (ATOCHEM ELF SA [FR]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 185 (C-428)(2632) 13 June 1987 ( TOYO SEIKAN K. LTD ) 20 January 1987 & JP-A-62 011 748, & JP62011748 A 19870120 |