EP0483701 - Method of noise reduction in hearing aids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.1994 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.1995 [1995/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASCOM AUDIOSYS AG Bernstrasse 41 CH-3175 Flamatt / CH | [1992/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schären, Beat Schulhaus CH-3305 Iffwil / CH | [1992/19] | Representative(s) | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte Postfach 8032 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [1992/19] | Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach CH-8050 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 91118282.2 | 26.10.1991 | [1992/19] | Priority number, date | CH19900003445 | 30.10.1990 Original published format: CH 344590 | [1992/19] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0483701 | Date: | 06.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0483701 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.1992 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/00, H03G3/34 | [1992/19] | CPC: |
H03G3/34 (EP);
H04R25/356 (EP);
H04R25/502 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, FR, IT [1992/19] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rauschunterdrückung bei Hörgeräten | [1992/19] | English: | Method of noise reduction in hearing aids | [1992/19] | French: | Procédé de réduction de bruit dans des prothèses auditives | [1992/19] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 19.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/37] | 20.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.1994 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3928733 ; | [A]US4405831 ; | [A]US4759071 |