EP0484787 - HCV-specific peptides, process for obtaining them and their use [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.08.2002 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 22.10.2008 [2008/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dade Behring Marburg GmbH Emil-von-Behring-Strasse 76 35041 Marburg / DE | [2008/43] |
Former [1998/42] | For all designated states Dade Behring Marburg GmbH Postfach 11 49 35001 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [1992/20] | For all designated states BEHRINGWERKE Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 1140 D-35001 Marburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krupka, Udo, Dr. Oberer Eichweg 29 W-3550 Marburg / DE | 02 /
Stüber, Werner, Dr. Cölber Weg 2 W-3551 Lahntal / DE | 03 /
Gerken, Manfred, Dr. Wannkopfstrasse 12 W-3550 Marburg / DE | 04 /
Brust, Stefan, Dr. Am Wall 32 W-3550 Marburg / DE | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [1993/37] |
Former [1992/20] | Aulmich, Gerhard, Dr., et al Hoechst AG Patent- und Lizenzabteilung Gebäude K 801 D-65926 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118349.9 | 28.10.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | DE19904034982 | 03.11.1990 Original published format: DE 4034982 | DE19914112743 | 19.04.1991 Original published format: DE 4112743 | DE19914120281 | 19.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4120281 | DE19914121431 | 28.06.1991 Original published format: DE 4121431 | [1992/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0484787 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0484787 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484787 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/08, C07K14/18, A61K39/12, C12N15/51, G01N33/576 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C07K14/005 (EP);
C07K16/109 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP);
C12N2740/16122 (EP);
C12N2770/24222 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1992/20] | C07K7/08, C07K7/10, C07K15/00, A61K39/12, C12N15/51, G01N33/576 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | HCV-spezifische Peptide, Mittel dazu und ihre Verwendung | [1992/20] | English: | HCV-specific peptides, process for obtaining them and their use | [1992/20] | French: | Peptides spécifiques pour HCV, procédé pour les synthétiser et leur emploi | [1992/20] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/41: (deleted) | EPB 2001/41: (deleted) | EPB 2001/41: (deleted) | EPB 1996/40: Teilanmeldung 96112414.6 eingereicht am 01/08/96 | EPB 1996/40: Divisional application 96112414.6 filed on 01/08/96 | EPB 1996/40: Demande divisionnaire 96112414.6 déposée le 01/08/96 | Examination procedure | 03.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/13] | 21.03.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 11.11.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP96112414.6 / EP0770679 | Opposition(s) | 11.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40] | Request for further processing for: | 18.03.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 18.03.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.05.1999 | Decision despatched | 09.12.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 09.12.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 27.01.1998 | Decision despatched | 11.11.1996 | Request for further processing filed | 11.11.1996 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request deemed not to be filed | 25.11.1996 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0318216 (CHIRON CORP [US]); | [A]EP0363025 (UNIV OSAKA RES FOUND [JP]); | [A]EP0388232 (CHIRON CORP [US]); | [XP]EP0419182 (OYA AKIRA DR DIRECTOR GENERAL [JP], et al); | [XP]EP0442394 (UNITED BIOMEDICAL INC [US]) |