EP0469645 - Vehicle speed control system for motor vehicle having an automatic transmission control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1995 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.03.1995 [1995/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome Kariya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi 2-Chome Kariya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miyake, Osamu Amidado, Fukuya, Miyoshi-cho Nishikamo-gun, Aichi-pref. / JP | 02 /
Suzumura, Nobuyasu 8-51, Hirai-cho Toyota city, Aichi-pref. / JP | 03 /
Kawata, Shoji 19-66, Fuchida, Aza, Ohnishi-cho Okazaki city, Aichi-pref. / JP | [1992/06] | Representative(s) | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/06] | Pellmann, Hans-Bernd, Dipl.-Ing., et al Patentanwaltsbüro Tiedtke-Bühling-Kinne & Partner Bavariaring 4 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118612.0 | 27.11.1987 | [1992/06] | Priority number, date | JP19860285233 | 29.11.1986 Original published format: JP 28523386 | JP19860285234 | 29.11.1986 Original published format: JP 28523486 | JP19860285235 | 29.11.1986 Original published format: JP 28523586 | JP19860285236 | 29.11.1986 Original published format: JP 28523686 | JP19860285237 | 29.11.1986 Original published format: JP 28523786 | JP19860285238 | 29.11.1986 Original published format: JP 28523886 | [1992/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0469645 | Date: | 05.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/06] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0469645 | Date: | 15.04.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0469645 | Date: | 30.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B60K31/00, B60K31/10, B60K41/06, F16H61/12 | [1992/16] | CPC: |
B60K31/107 (EP,US);
F16H61/12 (EP,US);
F16H2061/1224 (EP,US);
F16H2061/1268 (EP,US);
F16H2300/14 (EP,US);
F16H61/0213 (EP,US);
F16H61/10 (EP,US);
F16H61/14 (EP,US);
F16H61/16 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/06] | B60K31/10, B60K41/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/06] | Title | German: | Geschwindigkeitssteuerungssystem für Kraftfahrzeuge mit Steuerungssystem für automatisches Getriebe | [1992/06] | English: | Vehicle speed control system for motor vehicle having an automatic transmission control system | [1992/06] | French: | Système de commande de vitesse pour véhicule à moteur avec système de commande de transmission automatique | [1992/06] | Examination procedure | 02.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/32] | 30.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP87117615.2 / EP0270036 | Opposition(s) | 31.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP61129334 ; | [A]GB2102086 (NIPPON DENSO CO [JP], et al); | [A]EP0142044 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]); | [A]GB2060793 (NISSAN MOTOR) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 323 (M-531)(2379) 5 November 1986 & JP-A-61 129 334 ( TOYOTA MOTOR CORP. ) 17 June 1986, & JP61129334 A 19860617 |