EP0529148 - Permanent magnet material and method for making [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.05.1998 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo-to 103 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1995/44] | For all designated states TDK Corporation 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku, Tokyo-to 103 / JP | ||
Former [1993/09] | For all designated states TDK CORPORATION 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoneyama, Tstushito, c/o TDK CORPORATION 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Nakamura, Hideki, c/o TDK CORPORATION 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Fukuno, Akira, c/o TDK CORPORATION 13-1, Nihonbashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [1993/09] | Representative(s) | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Albert-Rosshaupter-Strasse 65 81369 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Alber, Norbert, et al Hansmann & Vogeser Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 70 08 60 81308 München / DE | ||
Former [1995/37] | Alber, Norbert, et al Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Hansmann, Vogeser, Dr. Boecker, Alber, Dr. Strych, Liedl Postfach 70 08 60 D-81308 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/52] | Meyer-Roxlau, Reiner Ferdinand, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Rottenbucher Strasse 50 D-82166 Gräfelfing / DE | ||
Former [1993/09] | Meyer-Roxlau, Reiner Ferdinand, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Rottenbucher Strasse 50 D-82116 Gräfelfing / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118669.0 | 31.10.1991 | [1993/09] | Priority number, date | JP19910244476 | 29.08.1991 Original published format: JP 24447691 | [1997/39] |
Former [1993/09] | JP19910024476 | 29.08.1991 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0529148 | Date: | 03.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0529148 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0529148 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 RE Reissue of patent specification | No.: | EP0529148 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | [1997/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/053, H01F41/02 | [1993/09] | CPC: |
H01F1/0571 (EP,US);
B22D11/0697 (EP,US);
Y10S428/928 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12465 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1993/09] | Title | German: | Material für Dauermagnet und Herstellungsverfahren | [1993/09] | English: | Permanent magnet material and method for making | [1993/09] | French: | Matériau pour aimant permanent et procédé de fabrication | [1993/09] | Examination procedure | 06.04.1994 | Examination requested [1994/22] | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.04.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP02080538 ; | [E]JP04028457 ; | [A]EP0341435 (OVONIC SYNTHETIC MATERIALS [US]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 014, no. 270 (C-0727)12 June 1990 & JP 02 080 538 A ( HTACHI METALS LTD ) 20 March 1990, & JP02080538 A 19900320 | [E] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 195 (M-1246)12 May 1992 & JP 04 028 457 A ( TDK CORP ) 31 January 1992, & JP04028457 A 19920131 |