EP0484860 - Refrigerating apparatus having a single thermostatic temperature control system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.01.1996 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.01.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.02.1996 [1996/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zanussi Elettrodomestici S.p.A. Via Giardini Cattaneo, 3, C.P. 147 I-33170 Pordenone / IT | [1992/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Marega, Paolo Via Aquileia 13 I-33084 Codenons, Pordenone / IT | [1992/20] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/20] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91118782.1 | 04.11.1991 | [1992/20] | Priority number, date | IT19900045766 | 05.11.1990 Original published format: IT 4576690 | [1992/20] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0484860 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0484860 | Date: | 01.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F25D29/00, F25D11/02 | [1992/20] | CPC: |
F25D29/00 (EP);
F25D11/022 (EP);
F25B2500/31 (EP);
F25B2600/0251 (EP);
F25D2400/02 (EP);
F25D2400/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1992/20] | Title | German: | Kühlgerät mit nur einer thermostatischen Temperaturregelvorrichtung | [1992/20] | English: | Refrigerating apparatus having a single thermostatic temperature control system | [1992/20] | French: | Appareil frigorifique à dispositif thermostatique unique de régulation de température | [1992/20] | Examination procedure | 29.06.1992 | Examination requested [1992/35] | 17.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.10.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 02.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2347634 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]); | [A]US4288854 (BURROUGHS MARK S); | [A]US4292813 (PADDOCK STEPHEN W); | [A]US4627245 (LEVINE MICHAEL R [US]); | [A]EP0387680 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]); | [AD]EP0388726 (ZANUSSI A SPA INDUSTRIE [IT]) |